blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2806640 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380014811 CN201710336010 CN201810756273 CN201810756275 CN201810756616 CN201810756996 CN201810756997 EP13738659



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013109127Global Dossier 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10306228Global Dossier 28.05.2019B2
US2018048905 15.02.2018A1
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
US201414373270 18.07.2014
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
US201715792086 24.10.2017
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9866839Global Dossier 09.01.2018B2
US2015334396 19.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019062551Global Dossier 18.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019054541Global Dossier 04.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019054540Global Dossier 04.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6445623BGlobal Dossier 26.12.2018B2
JP2017200216 02.11.2017A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6163576BGlobal Dossier 12.07.2017B2
JP2016136732 28.07.2016A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6163575BGlobal Dossier 12.07.2017B2
JP2016129356 14.07.2016A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6163574BGlobal Dossier 12.07.2017B2
JP2016129355 14.07.2016A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5886446BGlobal Dossier 16.03.2016B2
JP2015504289 05.02.2015A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109194967Global Dossier 11.01.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109194958Global Dossier 11.01.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108924571Global Dossier 30.11.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108924570Global Dossier 30.11.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108683916Global Dossier 19.10.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107580230Global Dossier 12.01.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
CN201380014811 21.01.2013
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104170382BGlobal Dossier 03.08.2018B
CN104170382 26.11.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2806640Global Dossier 27.04.2016A4
EP2806640 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014017500 04.07.2017A8
BR112014017500 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20130006736 21.01.2013
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
WO2013KR00493 21.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20180079274Global Dossier 10.07.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20180078213Global Dossier 09.07.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20140092288Global Dossier 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101971077BGlobal Dossier 22.04.2019B1
KR20180078212 09.07.2018A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101875206BGlobal Dossier 02.08.2018B1
KR20140092287 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101627085BGlobal Dossier 03.06.2016B1
KR20130086012 30.07.2013A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101527442BGlobal Dossier 11.06.2015B1
KR20140092286 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20120013996 10.02.2012
KR20120011672 06.02.2012
KR20120038971 16.04.2012
KR20120013462 09.02.2012
KR20120006564 20.01.2012