Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805092

EP2805092 - THREADED JOINT FOR PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
For all designated states
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54 rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / OSHIMA, Masahiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / UGAI, Shin
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / OKADA, Takashi
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / SASAKI, Masayoshi
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / YAMAGUCHI, Suguru
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
06 / SUGINO, Masaaki
c/o NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2017/19]
Former [2014/48]01 / OSHIMA, Masahiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / UGAI, Shin
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / OKADA, Takashi
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
04 / SASAKI, Masayoshi
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
05 / YAMAGUCHI, Suguru
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
06 / SUGINO, Masaaki
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Jackson, Martin Peter , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13738927.617.01.2013
[2017/19]
WO2013JP51363
Priority number, dateJP2012000892219.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012008922
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108931
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805092
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805092
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16L15/04, F16L58/18, E21B17/042, E21B17/08, F16L15/00, C10M171/00
[2016/08]
Former International [2014/48]F16L15/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBVERBINDUNG FÜR ROHRE[2014/48]
English:THREADED JOINT FOR PIPES[2014/48]
French:JOINT FILETÉ POUR TUYAUX[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
10.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.03.2017Fee for grant paid
15.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.04.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
03.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2016
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE17.01.2018
LU17.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE17.01.2018
LU17.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU17.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU17.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU17.01.2018
Former [2018/25]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
SM10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
RS10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
HR10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO2009060729  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]; VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS [FR]; YAMAGUCH) [YD] 1-6 * page 1, line 4 - line 11 * * page 18, line 4 - line 25; figures 3, 4, 6(A)-6(D) *;
 [Y]EP2216576  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]; VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS [FR]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 26] - [0031] - [0 89] - [0090]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP2212510  (VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS [FR]; SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 9] , [0 10] , [0 27] , [0 35] - [0042]; figures 1-6 *
International search[A]WO2009060729  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]WO2011027433  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.)