Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805092 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805092



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 319
16.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
03.04.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.04.2017 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
03.04.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.04.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
03.04.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
30.03.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Description Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.03.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
15.03.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.11.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.11.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
24.11.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
14.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
10.08.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
10.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.02.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.01.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
27.01.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
15.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
30.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
05.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.11.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 5
22.11.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 3
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 39