Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805092


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
16.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
07.06.2017 Change - representative
07.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - inventor published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
03.04.2017 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
03.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.03.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.03.2017 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.03.2017 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.03.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.11.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.11.2016 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - classification published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
12.08.2016 Amendment by applicant
22.01.2016 Change - classification published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - classification published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
22.01.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication