Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807741

EP2807741 - BROADBAND VIBRATIONAL ENERGY HARVESTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
Prad Research And Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / OCALAN, Murat
5927 Alameda Road
Unit 22718
Houston, Texas 77004 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Ford, Michael Frederick
Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Application number, filing date13738952.416.01.2013
WO2013US21642
Priority number, dateUS201261587221P17.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587221 P
US20131374216415.01.2013         Original published format: US201313742164
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109571
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807741
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02N2/18, B60G13/14, E21B41/00, F03G7/08, H02K35/00
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/49]H02N2/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:BREITBANDIGE SCHWINGUNGSENERGIEGEWINNUNG[2014/49]
English:BROADBAND VIBRATIONAL ENERGY HARVESTING[2014/49]
French:RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE VIBRATOIRE À LARGE BANDE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2014National basic fee paid 
18.07.2014Search fee paid 
18.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/38]
15.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JP2008261328  (KYOTO INST OF TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-4,7,12,15,18 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0118]; figure 20 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0061]; figure 1 * [Y] 5,6,17 [I] 8-11,13,14,16;
 [X]WO2006085869  (WELLDYNAMICS INC [US]; TIPS TIMOTHY R [US]) [X] 1,2,15,16,18 * page 4, line 1 - page 11, line 10; figures 1,2 *;
 [XY]WO2007102000  (PERPETUUM LTD [GB]; ROBERTS STEPHEN [GB]; CHINI BEHROOZ [GB]) [X] 18 * page 11, line 7 - page 13, line 19; figures 2,3 * [Y] 5,6,17
International search[Y]US2011074162  (FRANCESCO COTTONE ET AL.);
 [Y]US2010090655  (JOSEPH A. KEATING ET AL.);
 [A]US2008204005  (SHENG T. WANG);
 [A]US2008136292  (JACK THIESEN);
 [A]US2011140579  (SEUNG EON MOON ET AL.)