Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804460

EP2804460 - SICKLE BLADE SHAPE FOR USE IN A SICKLE CUTTER SYSTEM WITH INCREASED GROUND SPEED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2016  [2016/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MACDON INDUSTRIES LTD
680 Moray Street Winnipeg
Manitoba R3J 3S3 / CA
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / TALBOT, Francois
94 Sonning Bay
Winnipeg, Manitoba R2N 3M5 / CA
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date13739072.017.01.2013
WO2013CA50026
Priority number, dateUS201261587843P18.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587843 P
US201261664345P26.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261664345 P
US201261677169P30.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261677169 P
US201261677177P30.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261677177 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013106929
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804460
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A01D34/14, A01D34/18, B26D1/06
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:SICHELKLINGENFORM ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SICHELSCHNEIDSYSTEM MIT ERHÖHTER GRUNDGESCHWINDIGKEIT[2014/48]
English:SICKLE BLADE SHAPE FOR USE IN A SICKLE CUTTER SYSTEM WITH INCREASED GROUND SPEED[2014/48]
French:FORME DE SECTION DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COUPE EN FAUCILLE À VITESSE PAR RAPPORT AU SOL ACCRUE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Search fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
25.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/39]
08.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002035827  (YANG XINZHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7-10,12-14;
 [I]US4198803  (MILLS WILLIAM M [CA], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[A]US7328565  (SNIDER GEOFFREY U [CA], et al);
 [A]US4894979  (LOHRENTZ HOWARD R [US]);
 [A]US3553948  (WHITE ALLEN A);
 [A]US4246742  (CLARK STANLEY R, et al);
 [A]US3577716  (MCCARTY HORACE G, et al);
 [A]US4644738  (KRAMBECK FREDERICK C [US], et al);
 [A]US4236370  (SHAVER J LYLE);
 [A]US4660361  (REMILLARD RHEAL [CA], et al)