Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805334

EP2805334 - ALUMINUM CONDUCTOR PASTE FOR BACK SURFACE PASSIVATED CELLS WITH LOCALLY OPENED VIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2016  [2016/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heraeus Precious Metals North America Conshohocken LLC
24 Union Hill Road
West Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / KHADILKAR, Chandrashekhar S.
412 Quail Run Drive
Broadview Heights, OH 44147 / US
02 / KHATRI, Himal
Henkel Corporation
14000 Jamboree Road
Irvine, CA 92606 / US
03 / SRIDHARAN, Srinivasan
14073 Pine Lakes Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
04 / GRADDY, George E., Jr.
13754 Recrerdo Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
05 / SHAIKH, Aziz S.
16421 Winecreek Road
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
06 / MERCHANT, Nazarali N.
417 Penny Terrace
Fremont, CA 94538-4191 / US
 [2015/02]
Former [2014/48]01 / KHADILKAR, Chandrashekhar S.
412 Quail Run Drive
Broadview Heights, OH 44147 / US
02 / KHATRI, Himal
820 Sycamore Avenue Apt. 38
Vista, CA 82081 / US
03 / SRIDHARAN, Srinivasan
14073 Pine Lakes Drive
Strongsville, OH 44136 / US
04 / GRADDY, George E., Jr.
13754 Recrerdo Drive
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
05 / SHAIKH, Aziz S.
16421 Winecreek Road
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
06 / MERCHANT, Nazarali
16943 New Rochelle Way
66
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstrasse 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Herzog, Martin
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Immermannstraße 40
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date13739078.711.01.2013
WO2013US21109
Priority number, dateUS201261587068P16.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587068 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109466
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805334
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01B1/16, H01L31/18, C07F3/06
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMLEITPASTE FÜR RÜCKSEITENOBERFLÄCHENPASSIVIERTE ZELLEN MIT LOKAL GEÖFFNETEN DURCHKONTAKTIERUNGEN[2014/48]
English:ALUMINUM CONDUCTOR PASTE FOR BACK SURFACE PASSIVATED CELLS WITH LOCALLY OPENED VIAS[2014/48]
French:PÂTE DE CONDUCTEUR ALUMINIUM POUR CELLULES SUR LE CÔTÉ ARRIÈRE À SURFACE PASSIVÉE AVEC TROUS MÉTALLISÉS OUVERTS LOCALEMENT.[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2014National basic fee paid 
15.08.2014Search fee paid 
15.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/44]
02.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009101190  (SALAMI JALAL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-22 * claims 1-28; table 4 *;
 [X]EP2015367  (SHARP KK [JP]; NAMICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-22 * claims 1-18 *;
 [XD]US2006102228  (SRIDHARAN SRINIVASAN [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-3,6,13-20 * paragraph [0022]; claims 1-28 *;
 [XD]US2006289055  (SRIDHARAN SRINIVASAN [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-3,6,13-20 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1-20 *
International search[X]US2006231801  (ALAN FREDERICK CARROLL ET AL.);
 [X]US2010317143  (E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY);
 [A]RU2303831  (OTKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ''ZAVOD ELEKTRONNYKN MATERIALOV I PRI)