Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805334 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805334



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 141
22.02.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
15.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
28.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
02.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.11.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.10.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.09.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
27.08.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
27.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.08.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.08.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
15.08.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.12.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
17.12.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 43