Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800412

EP2800412 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASUREMENT AND HANDOVER RELIABILITY ENHANCEMENT IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASUREMENT ENHANCEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
[2017/01]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2017/26]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / XIAO, Dengkun
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / HAN, Jing
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / LI, Anjian
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / HE, Yuan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / WU, Tong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
06 / CUI, Jie
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
07 / WU, Liji
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13739126.421.01.2013
[2017/26]
WO2013CN70770
Priority number, dateCN2012101973421.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210019734
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107414
Date:25.07.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800412
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800412
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.07.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, // H04W36/30, H04W48/20, H04L5/00
[2017/01]
Former International [2014/52]H04W36/00, // H04W36/30, H04W48/20
Former International [2014/45]H04W24/08, H04W24/10, H04W36/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MESSUNGSERWEITERUNG UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT EINES HANDOVERS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2017/01]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASUREMENT AND HANDOVER RELIABILITY ENHANCEMENT IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2017/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L'AMÉLIORATION DE MESURES ET DE LA FIABILITÉ D'UN TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2017/01]
Former [2014/45]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNGSERWEITERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2014/45]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASUREMENT ENHANCEMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Former [2014/45]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR AMÉLIORER DES MESURES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014Translation filed 
28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Search fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
01.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2017Fee for grant paid
27.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17169246.0  / EP3270628
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE21.01.2018
LU21.01.2018
MT21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/30]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE21.01.2018
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2019/09]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE21.01.2018
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU21.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011057037  (MOTOROLA MOBILITY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-18,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0055] - [0060] - [0063] - [0066] , [0067] , [0080] , [0081] * * figures 3-5 * [I] 9,19;
 [I]  - NTT DOCOMO, "Issues on narrow measurement bandwidth", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-114243, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110819), vol. RAN WG4, no. Athens, Greece; 20110822, XP050543671 [I] 1-4,6-8,11-14,16-18 * sections 3, 5.1.3 *
 [I]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Discussion of RSRQ Measurement Bandwidth", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-115108 DISCUSSION OF RSRQ MEASUREMENT BW, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111003), vol. RAN WG4, no. Zhuhai; 20111010, XP050544199 [I] 1-4,6-8,11-14,16-18 * sections 2.2, 2.3, 2.4 *
 [A]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on measurement bandwidth", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-115602, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111107), vol. RAN WG4, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050567054 [A] 1-20 * section 2.2 *
 [A]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Analysis of Wider Measurement BW for RSRQ", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-115700 RSRQ WIDE BW, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111107), vol. TSG RAN, no. San Francisco, US; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050567133 [A] 9,10,19,20 * section 2 * * tables 8.1.2.3.1.1-1 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer; Measurements (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.214, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100614), no. V9.2.0, pages 1 - 14, XP050441717 [A] 1-20 * sections 5.1.1, 5.1.3 *
International search[X]WO2011123974  (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL [CN], et al);
 [A]CN101064920  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101291162  (ZTE CORP [CN])