EP2877828 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE HIGH-TEMPERATURE TEMPERATURE CONTROL OF A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUHR, Günter R. Eintrachtstr. 2 13187 Berlin / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Heiko Pfarrer-Fröhlich-Strasse 17 97295 Waldbrunn / DE | 03 /
STRACKE, Frank Benzstr. 17 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | 04 /
SCHMITT, Daniel Schillerweg 5 66806 Ensdorf / DE | 05 /
GRABENBAUER, Markus Robert-Koch-Str. 1 69234 Dielheim / DE | 06 /
BASTIAENS, Philippe Jägerhofstr. 129 42119 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
WEHNER, Frank Preinstr. 171 44265 Dortmund / DE | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13739145.4 | 17.07.2013 | [2018/28] | WO2013EP02126 | Priority number, date | DE20121014791 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012014791 | [2015/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014015962 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2877828 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2877828 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/42, A01N1/02 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
A01N1/0289 (EP);
G01N1/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-TEMPERIERUNG EINER PROBE | [2015/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE HIGH-TEMPERATURE TEMPERATURE CONTROL OF A SAMPLE | [2015/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR UN CONDITIONNEMENT THERMIQUE TRÈS RAPIDE D'UN ÉCHANTILLON | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2013 | AL | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | IE | 17.07.2018 | LU | 17.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.07.2013 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH459598 (BALZERS PATENT BETEILIG AG [LI]) [A] 1-23* figure 1 *; | [A]US5493865 (WOHLWEND MARTIN [CH]) [A] 1-23 * column 5, line 10 - line 16 *; | [A]EP0853238 (STUDER DANIEL DR [CH]) [A] 1-23 * column 9, line 26 - line 51 *; | [I]US6269649 (STUDER DANIEL [CH]) [I] 1-23 * column 1, line 27; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2007231787 (VOELKER MARK A [US]) [X] 11-14,18 * paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * [I] 1-10,15-17,19-23; | [XI] - JOHN C GILKEY ET AL, "Advances in Ultrarapid Freezing for the Preservation of Cellular Ultrastructure", JOURNAL OF ELECTRON MICROSCOPY TECHNIQUE, (19860101), pages 3 - 177, XP055086744 [X] 1-10,15-17,19-23 * Abschnitt: High pressure freezing; page 202 - page 205 * * figures 10,12 * [I] 11-14,18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jemt.1060030206 | [T] - Air Liquide, "Helium, He, Physical properties, safety, MSDS, enthalpy, material compatibility, gas liquid equilibrium, density, viscosity, flammability, transport properties", (20131105), URL: http://encyclopedia.airliquide.com/encyclopedia.asp, (20131105), XP055086737 [T] * section "Gas properties", Critical Point; page 2 * | [ID] - W. B. BALD, "The relative merits of various cooling methods", JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, (19851001), vol. 140, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2818.1985.tb02657.x, ISSN 0022-2720, pages 17 - 40, XP055086462 [ID] 1-23 * page 32, line 17 - line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2818.1985.tb02657.x | [I] - H. MOOR ET AL, "The influence of high pressure freezing on mammalian nerve tissue", CELL AND TISSUE RESEARCH, (19800701), vol. 209, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF00237626, ISSN 0302-766X, XP055086815 [I] 1-23 * Abschnitt: Materials and Methods; page 3 - page 5; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00237626 | by applicant | EP0373738 | US2009126373 | - L. L. KULESHOVA ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2007), vol. 28, pages 1585 - 1596 | - T. LI ET AL., HUMAN REPROD, (2007), vol. 23, pages 358 - 364 | - J. L. M. LEUNISSEN ET AL., J. MIC- ROSC, (2009), vol. 325, pages 25 - 35 | - H. HO- AGLAND ET AL., J. GENERAL PHYSIOL., (1942), vol. 25, pages 337 - 344 | - W. B. BALD, JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, (1985), vol. 140, pages 17 - 40 | - A. ZINGG, CEMENT AND CONCRETE RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 38, pages 552 - 529 | - A. C. BORGES, ACTA BIOMATER., (2011), vol. 7, pages 3412 - 3421 | - K. MCDONALD ET AL., METHODS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 79, pages 23 - 56 |