Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864252

EP2864252 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILICON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silicor Materials Inc.
1750 Lundy Avenue, Nº 610220
San Jose, CA 95161 / US
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MANCINI, Paul A.
3030 Breakwater Court Unit 128
Mississauga, Ontario L5B 4P1 / CA
02 / TURENNE, Alain
141 Stirling Ave. North
Kitchener, Ontario N2H 3G9 / CA
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13739310.425.06.2013
WO2013US47548
Priority number, dateUS201261663874P25.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261663874 P
US201361788008P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361788008 P
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014004463
Date:03.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864252
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/037
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON SILICIUM[2015/18]
English:METHOD FOR PURIFYING SILICON[2015/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE SILICIUM[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2015National basic fee paid 
13.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
06.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/24]
31.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2008110012  (6N SILICON INC [CA]; NICHOL SCOTT [CA]) [X] 1-51 * claims 1-22 * * page 11, paragraph last paragraph - page 12, paragraph first paragraph *;
 [A]WO2009012583  (6N SILICON INC [CA]; CHEN JIAN J [CA]; NICHOL SCOTT [CA]) [A] 1-51 * claims 1-62 * * examples 1-7 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2009092535  (NICHOL SCOTT [CA]) [A] 1-51 * the whole document *