Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2867624

EP2867624 - MULTI-CHANNEL ANGULAR POSITION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/19]MULTI-CHANNEL ROTARY ENCODER
[2016/23]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hengstler GmbH
Uhlandstrasse 49
78554 Aldingen / DE
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / BÜCHER, Johann
Kleeweg 14
78554 Aldingen / DE
02 / GRIGO, Uwe
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str 19
78166 Donaueschingen / DE
03 / KLAIBER, Wolfgang
In der Breite 10
78595 Hausen ob Verena / DE
04 / LINDEN, Martin
Alemannenstrasse 11
78669 Wellendingen / DE
 [2015/27]
Former [2015/19]01 / BÜCHER, Johann
Kleeweg 14
78554 Aldingen / DE
02 / GRIGO, Uwe
Talstrasse 49
78166 Donaueschingen / DE
03 / KLAIBER, Wolfgang
In der Breite 10
78595 Hausen ob Verena / DE
04 / LINDEN, Martin
Alemannenstrasse 11
78669 Wellendingen / DE
Representative(s)Sedlacek, Anton
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/19]Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date13739605.726.06.2013
[2016/49]
WO2013EP01877
Priority number, dateDE2012101287028.06.2012         Original published format: DE102012012870
[2015/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014000885
Date:03.01.2014
Language:DE
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2867624
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2867624
Date:07.12.2016
Language:DE
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/245
[2015/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRKANALIGER DREHWINKELGEBER[2015/19]
English:MULTI-CHANNEL ANGULAR POSITION SENSOR[2016/24]
French:DETECTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION MULTI-CANAUX[2016/23]
Former [2015/19]MULTI-CHANNEL ROTARY ENCODER
Former [2015/19]TRANSMETTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION MULTICANAUX
Entry into regional phase14.01.2015National basic fee paid 
14.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
13.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2016Fee for grant paid
01.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.08.2017  28.08.2017  ADMISSIBLE
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
 02  05.09.2017  12.09.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Fritz Kübler GmbH Zähl-und Sensortechnik
Schubertstrasse 47
78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Phoenixbau
Königstraße 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
 [2017/42]
Former [2017/39]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2017   
SICK AG
Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1
79183 Waldkirch / DE
19.10.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.12.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
06.02.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.02.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.02.2019Appeal received No.  T0614/19
29.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201604   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.06.2013
CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MT07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
MT07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
IE26.06.2017
LU26.06.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
LU26.06.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
MC07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/52]CZ07.12.2016
DK07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SI07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/38]CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
IT07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
SM07.12.2016
BG07.03.2017
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
PT07.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ07.12.2016
EE07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
PL07.12.2016
RO07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
SK07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
IS07.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ07.12.2016
ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/31]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
NL07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/28]ES07.12.2016
FI07.12.2016
HR07.12.2016
LT07.12.2016
LV07.12.2016
RS07.12.2016
SE07.12.2016
NO07.03.2017
GR08.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV07.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US7244929  (RODI ANTON [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 14 - line 19 * * column 2, line 13 - line 18 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 38 * * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]EP2233889  (MICRONAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2001006344  (GAESSLER HERMANN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE10360042  (VALEO MOTOREN & AKTUATOREN [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * figure - *
OppositionUS7244929
 EP2233889
 US2001006344
 DE10360042
 EP0575843
    - "Motorfeedback mit HIPERFACE", HIPERFACE Beschreibung, (20050300), pages 1 - 64, XP055414907
    - BEHREND PUPKES, "Versuchsstand für ein hochdynamisches Mehrachs-Servoantriebssystem", Fachhochschule Emden, (20070600), pages 1 - 54, XP055414908