EP2861410 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELEMENT OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL COMPRISING A NON- CRIMP FABRIC AND POLYETHERIMIDE (PEI) AND AN ELEMENT OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL OBTAINED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ten Cate Advanced Composites B.V. Campbellweg 30 7443 PV Nijverdal / NL | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENFERINK, Robertus Gerardus Hardenbergerweg 13 NL-7651 LJ Tubbergen / NL | 02 /
DE LEEUW, Roger Het Vossekamp 21 NL-7607 ZE Almelo / NL | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Slikker, Wilhelmina Johanna, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 13739830.1 | 17.06.2013 | WO2013NL50429 | Priority number, date | NL20122009017 | 15.06.2012 Original published format: NL 2009017 | [2015/17] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013187768 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861410 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/20, B29C70/50, B29B15/12 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
B29C70/504 (EP,US);
D06M15/53 (US);
B29B15/125 (EP,US);
B29C70/202 (EP,US);
C03C25/007 (US);
D06M15/59 (US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
D06M2101/32 (US);
D06M2101/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUTEILS AUS EINEM VERBUNDWERKSTOFF MIT EINEM NICHT-CRIMP-GEWEBE UND POLYETHERIMID (PEI) SOWIE IN DIESEM VERFAHREN GEWONNENES VERBUNDWERKSTOFFELEMENT | [2015/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELEMENT OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL COMPRISING A NON- CRIMP FABRIC AND POLYETHERIMIDE (PEI) AND AN ELEMENT OF COMPOSITE MATERIAL OBTAINED THEREWITH | [2015/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UN TISSU SANS ONDULATIONS ET DU POLYÉTHERIMIDE (PEI); ÉLÉMENT EN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE OBTENU AU MOYEN DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 13.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2019/09] | 21.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8302085 (SMITH TECH DEV H R [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 2 - line 29 * * page 5, lines 4-28 * * page 7, lines 26-37 * * page 15, line 26 - page 16, line 9 * * page 16, lines 21-35 *; | [A]DE3401195 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* page 4, lines 9-24; claims 1,5 *; | [Y]US4563232 (PEAKE STEVEN L [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 6, lines 3-24 * |