Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2867053

EP2867053 - ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM, PRIMARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT, USE OF AN ADJUSTMENT UNIT, AIR INTAKE, MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/19]ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM, PRIMARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT AND SECONDARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT, AIR INTAKE, MOTOR VEHICLE
[2017/46]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.04.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCi (Mirror Controls International) Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
3447 GK Woerden / NL
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HUIJZERS, Bastiaan
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
02 / VAN HOOF, Steve
c/o MCi (Mirror Controls International)
Netherlands B.V.
Pompmolenlaan 29
NL-3447 GK Woerden / NL
 [2015/19]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/38]
Former [2015/19]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13739844.202.07.2013
[2018/38]
WO2013NL50482
Priority number, dateNL2012200910502.07.2012         Original published format: NL 2009105
[2015/19]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014007617
Date:09.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2867053
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2867053
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60K11/08
[2015/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, PRIMÄRE EINSTELLUNGSEINHEIT, VERWENDUNG EINES EINSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, LUFTEINLASS UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2017/46]
English:ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM, PRIMARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT, USE OF AN ADJUSTMENT UNIT, AIR INTAKE, MOTOR VEHICLE[2017/46]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE, UNITÉ DE RÉGLAGE PRIMAIRE, UTILISATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE, ADMISSION D'AIR, VÉHICULE MOTORISÉ[2017/46]
Former [2015/19]EINSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, PRIMÄRE EINSTELLUNGSEINHEIT UND SEKUNDÄRE EINSTELLUNGSEINHEIT, LUFTEINLASS UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG
Former [2015/19]ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM, PRIMARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT AND SECONDARY ADJUSTMENT UNIT, AIR INTAKE, MOTOR VEHICLE
Former [2015/19]SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE, UNITÉ DE RÉGLAGE PRIMAIRE ET UNITÉ DE RÉGLAGE SECONDAIRE, ADMISSION D'AIR, VÉHICULE MOTORISÉ
Entry into regional phase02.02.2015National basic fee paid 
02.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
28.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2018Fee for grant paid
07.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.06.2019  13.06.2019  ADMISSIBLE
MinebeaMitsumi Technology Center Europe GmbH
Minebea-Weg 1
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. Peter Riebling Postfach 3160
88113 Lindau / DE
 [2020/03]
Former [2019/29]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2019  13.06.2019  ADMISSIBLE
Precision Motors Deutsche Minebea GmbH
Minebea-Weg 1
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. Peter Riebling Postfach 3160
88113 Lindau / DE
04.07.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.11.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP2248693  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 17,18 * figures 1,3 * [A] 1-16,19-21;
 [XA]US2011246023  (LOCKWOOD THOMAS K [US], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * [A] 1-16,19-21;
 [XA]US2012012410  (HORI KENJI [JP]) [X] 17,18 * paragraphs [0023] , [0047]; figures 7,10 * [A] 1-16,19-21;
 [X]JPS6418744  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 17,18 * abstract *
by applicantEP2248693