Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2867053 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2867053



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 782
13.12.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
13.12.2019 Communication of amended entries Opposition 4
09.12.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
09.12.2019 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
09.12.2019 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
06.12.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 2
06.12.2019 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
06.12.2019 Request for change of name - applicant Opposition 1
19.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 67
14.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 3
14.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.11.2019 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 30
04.07.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.07.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 18
27.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 6
27.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 22
27.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 6
14.06.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 54
14.06.2019 Request for documents Opposition 1
11.06.2019 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
11.06.2019 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Opposition 25
07.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 12
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 5
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 16
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 13
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 8
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 6
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 6
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 8
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 8
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 5
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 13
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 12
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 29
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 13
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 12
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 16
07.06.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 8
07.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
01.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
07.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
30.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
30.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
13.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Description Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.11.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
23.11.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
26.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.08.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
28.08.2015 Description Search / examination 1
28.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.04.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.02.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
02.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.01.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
14.11.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
09.01.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
09.01.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
22.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.11.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.07.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
02.07.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 4
02.07.2013 Description International Searching Authority 18
02.07.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 4