Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2867053


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.12.2019 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  15.01.2020  [2020/03]
18.11.2019 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
03.07.2019 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
14.06.2019 Opposition filed published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
17.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
11.08.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.03.2018 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.10.2017 Change - German title published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - English title published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - French title published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
05.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
04.09.2015 Change - extension states published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
31.08.2015 Amendment by applicant
03.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Request for examination filed published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.2015 Change - representative
03.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication