Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2872062

EP2872062 - BONE FIXATION TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2015/21]
Inventor(s)01 / GIORDANO, Michael
10136 Heather Lake Drive
Osceola, Indiana 46561 / US
02 / LOZIER, Antony J.
3224 N. 600 E.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
03 / MURPHY, Daniel P.
1259 E. 800 S.
Claypool, Indiana 46510 / US
 [2015/51]
Former [2015/21]01 / GIORDANO, Michael
818 Copperfield Dr. South
South Bend, Indiana 46614 / US
02 / LOZIER, Antony J.
3224 N. 600 E.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
03 / MURPHY, Daniel P.
1259 E. 800 S.
Claypool, Indiana 46510 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/40]
Former [2015/21]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13740152.711.07.2013
[2016/40]
WO2013US50024
Priority number, dateUS201261670183P11.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261670183 P
US201261696461P04.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261696461 P
US201261702815P19.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261702815 P
[2015/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014011841
Date:16.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2872062
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014
[2015/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2872062
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/92, A61B17/84, A61B17/88
[2016/17]
Former International [2015/21]A61B17/84, A61B17/88
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KNOCHENFIXIERUNGSWERKZEUG[2015/21]
English:BONE FIXATION TOOL[2015/21]
French:INSTRUMENT DE FIXATION D'OS[2016/17]
Former [2015/21]OUTIL DE FIXATION D'OS
Entry into regional phase11.02.2015National basic fee paid 
11.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
30.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2016Fee for grant paid
24.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16192264.6  / EP3225205
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2016
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2013
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010305624  (LOZIER ANTONY J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-17,19-21 * paragraphs [0053] , [0055] - [0057] - [0059] - [0062] - [0066] , [0069] , [0070] , [0072] , [0074]; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US5485887  (MANDANIS GEORGES [CH]) [A] 1,18 * column 4, lines 10-14 *