blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2872062 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2872062



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 405
19.07.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 21
19.07.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
19.07.2013 Description International Searching Authority 36
19.07.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 3
19.07.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
16.01.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 61
16.01.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
21.11.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.01.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.02.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.04.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
30.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
19.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1