Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2872062 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2872062



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 405
09.08.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
24.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
30.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
30.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.06.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.04.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.01.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
21.11.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
06.02.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
16.01.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.01.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 61
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.09.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
19.07.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.07.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 3
19.07.2013 Description International Searching Authority 36
19.07.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
19.07.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 21