blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2872062 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP13740152 EP16192264



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9987067Global Dossier 05.06.2018B2
US2015150617 04.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261702815 19.09.2012
WO2013US50024 11.07.2013
US201314413761 11.07.2013
US201261696461 04.09.2012
US201261670183 11.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3225205Global Dossier 04.10.2017A2
Priority number Date
EP13740152 11.07.2013
US201261702815 19.09.2012
US201261696461 04.09.2012
US201261670183 11.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2872062Global Dossier 05.10.2016B1
EP2872062 20.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261702815 19.09.2012
WO2013US50024 11.07.2013
US201261696461 04.09.2012
US201261670183 11.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2878713 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261702815 19.09.2012
WO2013US50024 11.07.2013
US201261696461 04.09.2012
US201261670183 11.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014011841Global Dossier 16.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261702815 19.09.2012
US201261696461 04.09.2012
US201261670183 11.07.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3225205