Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2872786

EP2872786 - HIGH-PHOSPHOROUS ELECTROLESS NICKEL (HPEN) TREATMENT FOR BUSHINGLESS CONNECTING ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.05.2017  [2017/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Caterpillar Inc.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria, IL 61629-9510 / US
[2015/21]
Inventor(s)01 / KOSKEY, Brian, Jeffrey
8665 East Acadia View Drive
Vail, AZ 85641 / US
02 / CASTNER, Gerald, David
441 Overland Drive
Greenwood, IN 46143 / US
03 / WHITE, Morris, Allen
12333 East 21st Street
Indianapolis, IN 46229 / US
 [2015/21]
Representative(s)Gahlings, Steven
Caterpillar
Legal Services
Eastfield
Peterborough PE1 5FQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/21]Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date13740154.311.07.2013
WO2013US50055
Priority number, dateUS201261670352P11.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261670352 P
US20131393439503.07.2013         Original published format: US201313934395
[2015/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014011861
Date:16.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2872786
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16C5/00, F16C9/04, F16C33/12
[2015/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
TitleGerman:STROMLOSE VERNICKELUNG MIT HOHEM PHOSPHORGEHALT FÜR EINE BUCHSENLOSE PLEUELSTANGE[2015/21]
English:HIGH-PHOSPHOROUS ELECTROLESS NICKEL (HPEN) TREATMENT FOR BUSHINGLESS CONNECTING ROD[2015/21]
French:TRAITEMENT AU NICKEL SANS ÉLECTRICITÉ À HAUTE TENEUR EN PHOSPHORE (HPEN) POUR BIELLE SANS COUSSINET[2015/21]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2014National basic fee paid 
18.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/21]
10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YA]US4974498  (LEMELSON JEROME [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 35; figure - * [A] 6-10;
 [YA]US5803614  (TSUJI HIDEO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 34 - column 3 * [A] 6-10;
 [A]US5480231  (SASAKI TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, lines 25-35; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9604485  (PANKL GEROLD [AT], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2 *