Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2852992

EP2852992 - BOLTLESS BATTERY CELL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2018/36]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Weiping
5405 Waldenhill Court
Superior Township, Michigan 48198 / US
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/36]
Former [2015/14]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13740392.913.05.2013
[2018/36]
WO2013US40731
Priority number, dateUS201261649820P21.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261649820 P
US20131383993115.03.2013         Original published format: US201313839931
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013176913
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2852992
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2852992
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/20, H01M2/26, H01M2/30
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BOLZENLOSE BATTERIEZELLENVERBINDUNG[2015/14]
English:BOLTLESS BATTERY CELL CONNECTION[2015/14]
French:CONNEXION SANS BOULONS DE CELLULES DE BATTERIE[2015/14]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2014National basic fee paid 
29.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/14]
15.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2018Fee for grant paid
24.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2018
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010085636  (JOHNSON CONTROLS SAFT ADVANCED [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0086]; figures 11,13-18 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 2,9,10;
 [Y]US2010247998  (HOSTLER JONATHAN E [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0081] , ["function" 7] , [ 101] *