Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2873115

EP2873115 - MULTI-PIECE SOCKET CONTACT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsch Engineered Connecting Devices, Inc.
3850 Industrial Avenue
Hemet CA 92545 / US
[2015/21]
Inventor(s)01 / FRIEDHOF, James P.
1736 Kings Road
Vista, California 92084 / US
02 / RENGIFO, Alex Robert
1412 Enchante Way
Oceanside, California 92056 / US
03 / BIANCA, Giuseppe
45656 Caminito Olite
Temecula, California 92592 / US
 [2015/21]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/21]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13740444.810.07.2013
WO2013US49834
Priority number, dateUS20121354910313.07.2012         Original published format: US201213549103
[2015/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014011716
Date:16.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2873115
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/11, H01R13/187
[2015/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
TitleGerman:MEHRTEILIGE SOCKEL-KONTAKT-ANORDNUNG[2015/21]
English:MULTI-PIECE SOCKET CONTACT ASSEMBLY[2015/21]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CONTACT D'ALVÉOLE MULTI-PIÈCES[2015/21]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2014National basic fee paid 
10.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/21]
21.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6475039  (DESPOUYS PAUL JEAN-BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,13 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 58; figures 1,7 * [I] 5,8,9,11,12,14,15;
 [XI]US4780097  (PISCITELLI R AMELIA [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,13 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-7 * [I] 5,9,12,14,15;
 [XI]US2004229490  (BERNAT JEAN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-14 * [I] 2,3,5,8-12,14,15;
 [A]US2011028039  (HAENGAERTNER GEORGES [CH], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figure 4 *