Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807761

EP2807761 - EXTENDED ACCESS BARRING (EAB) SIGNALING FOR A CORE NETWORK (CN) AND NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / SIROTKIN, Alexander
Intel.
947 Em Hamoshavot Way
Park Azorim
P.O. Box 10097
49527 Petach Tikva, M / IL
02 / JAIN, Puneet K.
203 NE 61st Terrace
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13740608.821.01.2013
WO2013US22423
Priority number, dateUS201261589774P23.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589774 P
US20121359165222.08.2012         Original published format: US201213591652
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112410
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807761
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:ERWEITERTE ZUGANGSSPERRRENSIGNALISIERUNG FÜR EIN KERNNETZ UND EINEN KNOTEN[2014/49]
English:EXTENDED ACCESS BARRING (EAB) SIGNALING FOR A CORE NETWORK (CN) AND NODE[2014/49]
French:SIGNALISATION D'INTERDICTION D'ACCÈS ÉLARGIE (EAB) POUR UN RÉSEAU CENTRAL (CN) ET UN NOEUD[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Search fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
26.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011058480  (DAHLEN ANDERS [SE]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0037] * * figures 3B,4 *;
 [A]EP1912461  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0106] * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Further Discussion on EAB", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-113339 EAB-R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110503), vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20110509, XP050495447 [A] 1-15 * pages 1-5 *
International search[X]US2011058480  (ANDERS DAHLEN);
 [A]JP2009005013  (NTT DOCOMO INC.);
 [A]KR20100060326  (KT CO., LTD.);
 [A]EP2009933  (NEC CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO0103463  (NOKIA CO., LTD.)
by applicantUS2011058480