Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806826

EP2806826 - Endoluminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]ENDOLUMINAL DEVICE AND METHOD
[2019/29]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intact Vascular, Inc.
150 Stafford Avenue, Suite 303
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
[2019/34]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Intact Vascular, Inc.
150 Stafford Avenue, Suite 303
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIASOLLI, Robert, M.
8232 E Skyview
Orange, CA 92869 / US
02 / SCHNEIDER, Peter
4644 Aukai Avenue
Honolulu, HI 96816 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13740616.124.01.2013
WO2013US23030
Priority number, dateUS201261590775P25.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261590775 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112768
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806826
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/064, A61B17/068, A61B17/072, A61F2/962, A61F2/848, A61F2/915
[2019/29]
Former International [2015/39]A61F2/915, A61F2/848
Former International [2014/49]A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:Endoluminale Vorrichtung[2019/29]
English:Endoluminal device[2019/29]
French:Dispositif endoluminal[2019/29]
Former [2014/49]ENDOLUMINALE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN
Former [2014/49]ENDOLUMINAL DEVICE AND METHOD
Former [2014/49]DISPOSITIF ENDOLUMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
08.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005096727  (ALLEN JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph 28 - page 1, paragraph 29 *;
 [A]US2011004237  (SCHNEIDER PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs 80,100 - pages 25,30 *
International search[X]US2002143386  (DAVILA LUIS A [US], et al);
 [Y]US7001422  (ESCAMILLA ANGELI [US], et al);
 [Y]US7137993  (ACOSTA PABLO [US], et al);
 [A]US2009157159  (SCHNEIDER PETER [US], et al);
 [A]US2009240270  (SCHNEIDER PETER [US], et al)
by applicantUS2005096727