Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808175

EP2808175 - Eraser [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]ERASING IMPLEMENT AND WRITING IMPLEMENT PROVIDED WITH ERASING IMPLEMENT
[2018/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pencil Company, Limited
23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8537 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / HAYAO, Sakae
c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED
23-37 Higashiohi 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8537 / JP
02 / OHTSUKA, Hiroshi
c/o Yokohama Office
MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED
5-12 Irie 2-chome
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8550 / JP
03 / NISHIDA, Tsuyoshi
c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED
23-37 Higashiohi 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8537 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/34]
Former [2014/49]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13740655.924.01.2013
[2018/34]
WO2013JP51499
Priority number, dateJP2012001223624.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012236
JP2012003810824.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012038108
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111832
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808175
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808175
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:B43L19/00, B43K29/02
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Radiergummi[2018/14]
English:Eraser[2018/14]
French:Gomme[2018/14]
Former [2014/49]LÖSCHVORRICHTUNG UND SCHREIBVORRICHTUNG MIT DER LÖSCHVORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/49]ERASING IMPLEMENT AND WRITING IMPLEMENT PROVIDED WITH ERASING IMPLEMENT
Former [2014/49]INSTRUMENT D'EFFACEMENT ET INSTRUMENT D'ÉCRITURE DOTÉ D'UN INSTRUMENT D'EFFACEMENT
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014Translation filed 
21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Search fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
10.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2018Fee for grant paid
13.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2017
Opposition(s)23.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
MC22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
LU24.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
MC22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT22.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2009107236  (PILOT INK CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 1-3;
 [Y]CH311830  (KURER EDUARD [CH]; REBMANN ALFONS J [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 28; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5897265  (WILSON CAROLINE [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE269229  (CURT FRIEDLAENDER) [Y] 3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB190917944  (WANKLYN HERBERT ALEXANDER [GB]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2005335211  (SUN-STAR STATIONARY CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2009107236  (THE PILOT INK CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2005313404  (THE PILOT INK CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPS103722Y  (ARATA MIKI);
 [Y]JPS57191598U  (HAKKO ENPITSU KABUSHIKI KAISHA)
ExaminationJP2005335211
by applicantJP2009107240
 JP2010241867