Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807507

EP2807507 - METHOD TO CHARACTERIZE HETEROGENEOUS ANISOTROPIC MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
PRAD Research and Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LT  NO  PL  RO  SI  SK  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
For:BE  EE  ES  FI  IS  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  RS  SE  SM 
PRAD Research and Development Limited
P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
Inventor(s)01 / JOCKER, Jeroen
Burgemeester Pruissingel 49
NL-3131 JN Vlaardingen / NL
02 / WIELEMAKER, Erik
Tortellaan73
NL-2566 CG Den Haag / NL
03 / PRIOUL, Romain, Charles, Andre
6 Adams Street
Somerville, Massachusetts 02145 / US
04 / VALERO, Henri-Pierre
House-C
265-4 Yamate-Cho
Naka-Ku
Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 231-0862 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Ford, Michael Frederick
Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Application number, filing date13740671.622.01.2013
WO2013US22535
Priority number, dateUS201261589710P23.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589710 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112466
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807507
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/40, G01V1/48
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG HETEROGENER ANISOTROPER MEDIEN[2014/49]
English:METHOD TO CHARACTERIZE HETEROGENEOUS ANISOTROPIC MEDIA[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CARACTÉRISATION DE MILIEUX ANISOTROPES HÉTÉROGÈNES[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
17.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/34]
13.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6714480  (SINHA BIKASH K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-11,13,14 * column 5, line 65 - column 8, line 32 * * column 15, line 58 - column 17, line 59 * * figures 1,2,5,9-12 *;
 [X]  - ANNE-KARI FURRE ET AL, "Deriving effects of pressure depletion on elastic framework moduli from sonic logs", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (20081018), vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2478.2008.00744.x, ISSN 0016-8025, pages 427 - 437, XP055223586 [X] 1-3,5-7,10-15 * abstract * * page 429, column right, paragraph 6 - page 431, column right, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,5,6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2008.00744.x
 [X]  - W. RABBEL ET AL, "Superdeep vertical seismic profiling at the KTB deep drill hole (Germany): Seismic close-up view of a major thrust zone down to 8.5 km depth", JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, US, (20040930), vol. 109, no. B9, doi:10.1029/2004JB002975, ISSN 0148-0227, pages 1 - 20, XP055223588 [X] 1,2,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] - [0070] * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1029/2004JB002975
International search[A]US2003167835  (SINHA ET AL.);
 [A]US7913775  (JEFFRYES ET AL.);
 [A]US5109697  (MILLHEIM ET AL.);
 [A]US2008236270  (DENICHOU ET AL.);
 [A]US2008137478  (SOLLNER, WALTER)
by applicantUS6714480
    - FURRE; ANNE-KARI ET AL., "Deriving effects of pressure depletion on elastic framework moduli from sonic logs", GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, (2009), vol. 57, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2478.2008.00744.x, page 427, XP055223586

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2008.00744.x
    - RABBEL, W. ET AL., "Superdeep vertical seismic profiling at the KTB deep drill hole (Germany): Seismic close-up view of a major thrust zone down to 8.5 km depth", JOURNAL OF GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 109, no. B9, doi:doi:10.1029/2004JB002975, page B09309, XP055223588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1029/2004JB002975