Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808971

EP2808971 - POWER SUPPLY SWITCHING DEVICE AND SWITCH BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / SHINOMOTO, Yosuke
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / HATAKEYAMA, Kazunori
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / YAMAKAWA, Takashi
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / KASUGAI, Makoto
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
05 / TSUCHIMOTO, Naohide
c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date13740689.825.01.2013
WO2013JP51595
Priority number, dateJP2012001568027.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012015680
JP2012016627426.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012166274
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111858
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808971
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/38, H02J9/06
[2016/16]
Former International [2014/49]H02J3/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:STROMVERSORGUNGSSCHALTUNG UND PLATINE[2014/49]
English:POWER SUPPLY SWITCHING DEVICE AND SWITCH BOARD[2014/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE ET TABLEAU DE COMMUTATION[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014Translation filed 
22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Search fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
20.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]GB2394130  (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11-14 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4 [I] 6,7,10;
 [XY]EP1965483  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4
International search[Y]JP2002252928  (MIKI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JPH0865899  (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2005278297  (SHARP CORP.);
 [Y]JP2004199881  (FUJI ELECTRIC FA COMPONENTS & SYSTEMS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2008206266  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010093878  (CENTRAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF ELECTRIC POWER INDUSTRY);
 [A]JP2004129461  (DENSEI-LAMBDA KABUSHIKI KAISHA)
by applicantJP2004242458
 JP2007209133