Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2808971


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.12.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.08.2017 First examination report
20.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.09.2016 Amendment by applicant
18.03.2016 Change - classification published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
18.03.2016 Change - classification published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
18.03.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication