Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2808971 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006632 EP13740689



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9825488Global Dossier 21.11.2017B2
US2014339900 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
WO2013JP51595 25.01.2013
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140108704Global Dossier 12.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
WO2013JP51595 25.01.2013
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101741386BGlobal Dossier 29.05.2017B1
KR20160116350 07.10.2016A
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
WO2013JP51595 25.01.2013
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5734481BGlobal Dossier 17.06.2015B2
JP2014131481 10.07.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2014043257 05.03.2014
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104067475BGlobal Dossier 26.09.2017B
CN104067475 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
WO2013JP51595 25.01.2013
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2808971Global Dossier 20.04.2016A4
EP2808971 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
WO2013JP51595 25.01.2013
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013111858Global Dossier 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
JP2012015680 27.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5497115BGlobal Dossier 21.05.2014B2
JP2013176278 05.09.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012166274 26.07.2012
JP2012015680 27.01.2012