Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808415

EP2808415 - PIPELINE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / NAGATA, Yukinobu
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
02 / TSURU, Eiji
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
03 / SHINOHARA, Yasuhiro
c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8071 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/47]
Former [2014/49]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13740715.128.01.2013
[2017/47]
WO2013JP51765
Priority number, dateJP2012001499127.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012014991
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111902
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808415
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808415
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/14, F16L13/02, B23K9/028, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/26, C22C38/38, C22C38/28, F16L13/04
[2017/23]
Former International [2016/02]C22C38/14, F16L13/02, B23K9/028, C22C38/00, B23K31/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/26, C22C38/38, B23K101/10, C22C38/28, F16L13/04
Former International [2014/49]C22C38/14, F16L13/02, B23K9/028
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRLEITUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/49]
English:PIPELINE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF[2014/49]
French:PIPELINE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014Translation filed 
07.08.2014National basic fee paid 
07.08.2014Search fee paid 
07.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
01.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2017Fee for grant paid
10.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2017
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE28.01.2018
LU28.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
GB22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/13]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE28.01.2018
LU28.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
GB22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2019/09]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
IE28.01.2018
LU28.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
LU28.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
LU28.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
LU28.01.2018
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP2006281217  (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]WO2008072970  (STATOIL ASA [NO]; ENDAL GEIR [NO]; LEVOLD ERIK [NO]; ILSTAD HAAVAR [NO) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 12-29 *;
 [A]EP2192203  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] * * example - *
International search[A]JP2006281217  (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]JPH03133576  (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.);
 [A]JPH03211255  (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.);
 [A]JP2006122932  (JFE STEEL CORP.)
by applicantJPH03133576
 JPH03211255
 JP2001192773
 JP2006281217