Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807826

EP2807826 - 3D ZOOM IMAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/22]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KATZ, Sagi
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / ADLER, Avishai
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / YAHAV, Giora
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / COHEN, David
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / LARRY, Eli
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / FELZENSHTEIN, Shlomo
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Germany LLP
IP
Rosental 4
80331 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date13740760.708.01.2013
[2016/48]
WO2013US20693
Priority number, dateUS20121335661823.01.2012         Original published format: US201213356618
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112284
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807826
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807826
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/10, H04N13/00
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/49]H04N13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDGEBER MIT 3D-ZOOM[2014/49]
English:3D ZOOM IMAGER[2014/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRISE D'IMAGES 3D AVEC FONCTION D'AGRANDISSEMENT[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Search fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
21.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2016Fee for grant paid
21.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2015
Opposition(s)31.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CY30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE08.01.2017
LU08.01.2017
MT08.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU08.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE08.01.2017
LU08.01.2017
MT08.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE08.01.2017
LU08.01.2017
MT08.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE08.01.2017
LU08.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU08.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
IT30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[IA]DE102009045600  (IFM ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-10;
 [A]DE102009046108  (IFM ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2008273758  (FUCHS OLIVER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 41 - column 45; figure 1 *;
 [L]DE102012207328  (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [L] 1-10 * column 30 - column 32; figures 5-7 *;
 [A]JP2010206643  (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011019924  (ELGERSMA MICHAEL RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2011169998  (CANETTI ISAAC [IL]);
 [A]US2011019924  (ELGERSMA MICHAEL RAY [US], et al);
 [A]US2011285826  (BICKERSTAFF IAN [GB], et al);
 [A]US2011299059  (BUETTGEN BERNHARD [CH], et al);
 [A]WO2011104706  (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al)
by applicantDE102009045600
 DE102009046108
 US2008273758