Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807826 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807826



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 192
05.10.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
23.06.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
15.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.06.2016 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
15.06.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
16.09.2015 Description Search / examination 2
16.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.09.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.05.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.04.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 5
13.04.2015 General authorisation Search / examination 2
13.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.04.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
16.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21