Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2807826


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
06.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Change - representative
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Change - representative
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
28.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
26.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
21.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.06.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.05.2015 First examination report
01.05.2015 Change - classification published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
01.05.2015 Change - classification published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
01.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Change - applicant published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
17.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication