Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2807826 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006368 EP13740760



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101992511BGlobal Dossier 24.06.2019B1
KR20140123079 21.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012
WO2013US20693 08.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015510586Global Dossier 09.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012
WO2013US20693 08.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104094594BGlobal Dossier 20.06.2017B
CN104094594 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012
WO2013US20693 08.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2807826Global Dossier 30.11.2016B1
EP2807826 03.06.2015A4
EP2807826 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012
WO2013US20693 08.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013112284Global Dossier 01.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9720089Global Dossier 01.08.2017B2
US2013188022 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213356618 23.01.2012