Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799993

EP2799993 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYSTEM DIFFERENTIAL UPGRADE AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Device Co., Ltd.
Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / WEI, Zhonghui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang Shenzhen
Guangdong 518149 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13740816.721.01.2013
WO2013CN70747
Priority number, dateCN201212039029.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210020390
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110233
Date:01.08.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799993
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14, G06F9/44
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIFFERENZIELLES UPGRADE UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYSTEM DIFFERENTIAL UPGRADE AND MOBILE TERMINAL[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE À NIVEAU DIFFÉRENTIEL DE SYSTÈME ET TERMINAL MOBILE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014Translation filed 
31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Search fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
20.04.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6438749  (CHAMBERLAIN BENJAMIN C [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 2A,2B,3,5A,5B,7 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 13,14;
 [I]US2005132358  (PEEV IGOR B [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,3-5 *;
 [Y]US2007006208  (NGUYEN PHIDIEN H [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2007051958  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * pages 1-13 *;
 [A]US2005278399  (HERLE SUDHINDRA P [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2006004756  (PELEG SHARON [IL], et al) [Y] 2-4,8-10 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0159] * * figures 1,4,8-10 *;
 [A]US6237144  (DELO JOHN C [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 5 * * column 12, line 66 - column 13, line 21 *
International search[Y]CN102193805  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD);
 [Y]CN102231671  (SHANGHAI SYNACAST MEDIA TECH CO LTD);
 [Y]CN101038549  (BEIJING VENUS INFORMATION TECH [CN]);
 [A]CN101702730  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]US2009271779  (CLARK JONATHAN [US]);
 [XP]CN102609328  (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD)