Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808410

EP2808410 - ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR HEAT EXCHANGER FIN AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AS WELL AS HEAT EXCHANGER USING SAID ALUMINUM ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UACJ Corporation
1-7-2, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJITA, Kazuko
c/o UACJ Corporation
1-7-2, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
02 / NIIKURA, Akio
c/o UACJ Corporation
1-7-2, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
03 / MURASE, Takashi
c/o UACJ Corporation
1-7-2, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/27]
Former [2014/49]Baumgärtel, Gunnar
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13740923.125.01.2013
[2019/27]
WO2013JP51664
Priority number, dateJP2012001493927.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012014939
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111884
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808410
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808410
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K1/00, B22D25/02, B23K35/28, B23K35/00, B23K35/02, C22C21/02, C22C21/04, C22C21/08, C22C21/10, F28F21/08, F28F1/12, C22F1/00, C22F1/043, C22F1/047, C22F1/053
[2019/07]
Former International [2014/49]C22C21/00, B23K20/00, C22F1/043, C22F1/047, C22F1/053, C22F1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHERRIPPE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT DIESER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG[2019/07]
English:ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR HEAT EXCHANGER FIN AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, AS WELL AS HEAT EXCHANGER USING SAID ALUMINUM ALLOY[2014/49]
French:ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR AILETTE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, AINSI QU'UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR UTILISANT LEDIT ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM[2014/49]
Former [2014/49]ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHERRIPPE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT DIESEM ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG
Entry into regional phase21.08.2014Translation filed 
21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Search fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
19.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2019Fee for grant paid
23.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2005139505  (FURUKAWA SKY KK) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0018] , [0021] - [0025] - [0029] - [0043] - [0050] * * tables 1,2 *;
 [AD]JP2010168613  (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *
International search[A]JP2010168613  (FURUKAWA-SKY ALUMINUM CORP.);
 [A]JP2001262264  (KOBE STEEL, LTD.);
 [A]JP2004332106  (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2009068056  (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [AP]JP2012051028  (FURUKAWA-SKY ALUMINUM CORP.);
 [AP]JP2012040611  (FURUKAWA-SKY ALUMINUM CORP.)
by applicantJP2008303405
 JP2009161835
 JP2008308760
 JP2010168613