Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808173

EP2808173 - LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE SUPPORT, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE SUPPORT MANUFACTURING METHOD AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE MASTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujifilm Corporation
26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-0031 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / NAMBA, Yusuke
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
02 / OKANO, Keio
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
03 / KUROKAWA, Shinya
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
04 / SAWADA, Hirokazu
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
 [2015/19]
Former [2014/49]01 / NAMBA Yusuke
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
02 / OKANO Keio
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
03 / KUROKAWA Shinya
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
04 / SAWADA Hirokazu
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
4000 Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13741159.116.01.2013
WO2013JP50673
Priority number, dateJP2012001223924.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012239
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111652
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808173
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:B41N3/03, B41N1/08, C25D11/12, C25D11/18, G03F7/09, // C25D11/00
[2015/27]
Former International [2014/49]B41N3/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:TRÄGER FÜR EINE LITHOGRAPHIE-DRUCKPLATTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES TRÄGERS FÜR EINE LITHOGRAPHIE-DRUCKPLATTE UND MASTER FÜR DIE LITHOGRAPHIE-DRUCKPLATTE[2014/49]
English:LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE SUPPORT, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE SUPPORT MANUFACTURING METHOD AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE MASTER[2014/49]
French:SUPPORT DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUPPORT DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE ET ORIGINAL DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014Translation filed 
09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Search fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
05.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/25]
03.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO2011081064
 [A]JP2007237397
 [A]JPH11291657
 [A]JP2002365791
 [A]JPH11174663
 [A]JPH10264548
 [A]JPH0257391
 [A]JPS6072794
by applicant WO2011081064
  JPS4818327B
  JPS5040047B
  GB1412768
  JP2005254638
  US2714066
  US3181461
  JP2003001956
  JP2009255434
  JPS4841708B
  US3458311
  JPS5549729B
    Senryo Binran, THE SOCIETY OF SYNTHETIC ORGANIC CHEMISTRY