Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809433

EP2809433 - ELECTROSPUN POROUS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeus Industrial Products, Inc.
3737 Industrial Boulevard
Orangeburg, South Carolina 29118 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / BALLARD, Robert, L.
2242 Griffith Drive
Orangeburg, SC 29118 / US
02 / ANNEAUX, Bruce, L.
413 Cannon Knoll Road
Lexington, SC 29073 / US
03 / MANASCO, Joshua, L.
935 Briar Bush Lane
West Columbia, SC 29172 / US
04 / GARNER, David, P.
201 Belltrees Drive
Lexington, SC 29172 / US
05 / HAO, Ping
8304 Skye Lochs Drive
Waxhaw, NC 28173 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
PartG mbB
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
[2017/44]
Former [2014/50]Hofstetter, Alfons J.
Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Balanstraße 57
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13741191.425.01.2013
[2017/44]
WO2013US23073
Priority number, dateUS201261591555P27.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591555 P
US201261605510P01.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261605510 P
US201261620179P04.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261620179 P
US201261709450P04.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261709450 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112793
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809433
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809433
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D69/10, B01D69/06, B01D71/36, B01D69/02, D04H1/728
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROGESPONNENE PORÖSE MEDIEN[2014/50]
English:ELECTROSPUN POROUS MEDIA[2014/50]
French:MILIEUX POREUX ÉLECTROFILÉS[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Search fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
17.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2017Fee for grant paid
22.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17193355.9  / EP3292905
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2016
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/50]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
LU25.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/47]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
LU25.01.2018
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2010083530  (ZEUS IND PRODUCTS INC [US]; ANNEAUX BRUCE L [US]; BALLARD ROBERT [US];) [Y] 1,4-8,23 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] *;
 [X]WO2009018463  (DONALDSON CO INC [US]; FERRER ISMAEL [US]; YANG CHUANFANG [US]) [X] 1,5,23 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 5 * * page 18, lines 13-32 * * page 19, lines 23-33; claims 1,2,12,15,16 *;
 [Y]EP2223725  (BHA GROUP HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 1,4-8,23 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0044] *;
 [A]US2008264259  (LEUNG WALLACE W [HK]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0 40] , [0045] *
International search[X]US2010107881  (HEALEY, DAVID T. ET AL.);
 [X]US2008307971  (HORIE, YURI ET AL.);
 [A]US2011174720  (CHEN, LIANG ET AL.);
 [A]US2011309014  (HOSOYA, TAKAYOSHI ET AL.);
 [A]US2008110342  (ENSOR, DAVID S. ET AL.);
 [A]WO2010124899  (SAATI S.P.A.);
 [XP]US2012114722  (BALLARD, ROBERT L. ET AL.)
by applicantUS2158416
 US4432916
 US4287139
 US4143196
 US4043331
 US4689186
 US6641773
 US4323525
 US4044404
 US8178030
 WO2010083530
 WO2009018463
 EP2223725
 US2008264259
 US2012114722
 US2010193999
 US6743273
 US7815427
 US2003017208
 US2008307766
 US2009127747
 US2009199717
 US2010018641
 US2011111012
 US2011139008
 US2010218595
 US2009071327
 US2006201511
 US2005183232