EP2820424 - SOLUBLE MANF IN PANCREATIC BETA-CELL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts 333 South Street Suite 400 Shrewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URANO, Fumihiko 13 Rio Vista Drive Saint Louis, Missouri 63124 / US | 02 /
KANEKURA, Kohsuke 9197 Wrenwood Lane Brentwood, Missouri 63144 / US | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13741203.7 | 23.01.2013 | [2016/49] | WO2013US22768 | Priority number, date | US201261590021P | 24.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261590021 P | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112602 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820424 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820424 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/50, A61K38/18, A61K31/473 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/6872 (US);
A61K31/473 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (US);
C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
G01N33/5038 (US);
G01N33/507 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
G01N2333/475 (US);
G01N2500/10 (US);
G01N2800/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | G01N33/68, G01N33/50, A61K38/18 | ||
Former IPC [2015/02] | G01N33/68, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSLICHER MANF IN PANKREAS-BETAZELLEN-ERKRANKUNGEN | [2015/02] | English: | SOLUBLE MANF IN PANCREATIC BETA-CELL DISORDERS | [2015/02] | French: | MANF SOLUBLE DANS LES TROUBLES DES CELLULES BÊTA PANCRÉATIQUES | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 11.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2013 | AL | 07.12.2016 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | RS | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | IE | 23.01.2017 | LU | 23.01.2017 | MT | 23.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.01.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
TR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.01.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 23.01.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.01.2013 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
RS | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004010946 (DOMANI SCIENCES LLC [US]) [X] 1,5-9 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 15; claims 15-16 *; | [X]US2008200453 (CINCOTTA ANTHONY H [US]) [X] 1,5-9 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067]; claims 1,3,8 *; | [X]WO2008150480 (VEROSCIENCE LLC [US]) [X] 1,5-9 * page 36, line 5 - page 37, line 9 *; | [X]WO2010072383 (7ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 10,12-14 * page 19, line 28 - page 19, line 32; claim 2 * * page 23, line 5 - line 8 * * page 22, line 26 - page 23, line 28 * * page 25, line 6 - line 10 * * examples 2,3; claim 11 *; | [X]WO2011069051 (CALIPER LIFE SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9* page 11, line 16 - line 30; claims 12-13 *; | [A]WO2011143788 (ZHEJIANG BETA PHARMA INC [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO2011152658 (CELLTRION CHEMICAL RES INST [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [X]WO2011156248 (VEROSCIENCE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9 * page 37, line 20 - page 38, line 25; claims 18,39-40 *; | [E]WO2013034805 (ARUMAEE URMAS [FI], et al) [E] 1-14 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 3 * * page 12, line 23 - line 32 *; | [T] - MARIA LINDAHL ET AL, "MANF Is Indispensable for the Proliferation and Survival of Pancreatic [beta] Cells", CELL REPORTS, (20140401), vol. 7, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2014.03.023, ISSN 2211-1247, pages 366 - 375, XP055161920 [T] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2014.03.023 | International search | [A]US2002182198 (COMMISSIONG JOHN W [CA], et al); | [A]US2009282495 (SAARMA MART [FI], et al); | [A]US2011212055 (COMMISSIONG JOHN W [US]); | [A] - TADIMALLA ET AL., "Mesencephalic astrocyte-derived neurotrophic factor (MANF) is an ischemia-inducible secreted endoplasmic reticulum (ER) stress response protein in the heart", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (20081121), vol. 103, no. 11, pages 1249 - 1258, XP002591352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/circresaha.108.180679 | [A] - VOUTILAINEN ET AL., "'Mesencephalic astrocyte-derived neurotrophic factor is neurorestorative in rat model of parkinson's disease'", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20090729), vol. 29, no. 30, pages 9651 - 9659, XP055160136 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.0833-09.2009 | by applicant | US5223409 | US5403484 | US5571698 | US5716928 | US5858401 | US6007839 | US6063400 | US2004028670 | US2011123443 | - PIPELEERS ET AL., NOVARTIS FOUND SYMP., (2008), vol. 292, pages 19 - 24 | - OSLOWSKI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. ENDOCRINOL. DIABETES OBES., (2010), vol. 17, pages 107 - 112 | - OSLOWSKI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (2011), vol. 23, pages 207 - 215 | - FONSECA ET AL., TRENDS ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2011), vol. 22, pages 266 - 274 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - SOLA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (2009), vol. 98, pages 1123 - 1245 | - MINTO, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1997), vol. 281, pages 93 - 102 | - ROHATAGI, J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 35, pages 1187 - 1193 | - TJWA, ANN. ALLERGY ASTHMA IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 75, pages 107 - 111 | - RAO, J. BIOMATER SCI. POLYM. ED., (1995), vol. 7, pages 623 - 645 | - GAO, PHARM. RES., (1995), vol. 12, pages 857 - 863 | - EYLES, J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 49, pages 669 - 674 | - AL-MUHAMMED, J. MICROENCAPSUL., (1996), vol. 13, pages 293 - 306 | - CHONN, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 6, pages 698 - 708 | - OSTRO, AM. J. HOSP. PHARM., (1989), vol. 46, pages 1576 - 1587 | - HIDALGO-ARAGONES, J. STEROID BIOCHEM. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 58, pages 611 - 617 | - GRONING, PHARMAZIE, (1996), vol. 51, pages 337 - 341 | - FOTHERBY, CONTRACEPTION, (1996), vol. 54, pages 59 - 69 | - JOHNSON, J. PHARM. SCI., (1995), vol. 84, pages 1144 - 1146 | - ROHATAGI, PHARMAZIE, (1995), vol. 50, pages 610 - 613 | - BROPHY, EUR. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1983), vol. 24, pages 103 - 108 | - OSTERGAARD ET AL., EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, pages 5853 - 5862 | - MERKSAMER ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 135, pages 933 - 947 | - DOOLEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 22284 - 22293 | - SRINIVASAN ET AL., INDIAN J. MED. RES., (2007), vol. 125, pages 451 - 472 | - REES ET AL., DIABETIC MED., (2005), vol. 22, pages 359 - 370 | - LAM, ANTICANCER DRUG DES., (1997), vol. 12, page 145 | - DEWITT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, page 6909 | - ERB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1994), vol. 91, page 11422 | - ZUCKERMANN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 2678 | - CHO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1303 | - CARRELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2059 | - CARELL ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, page 2061 | - GALLOP ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 1233 | - HOUGHTEN, BIO/TECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 412 - 421 | - LAM, NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84 | - FODOR, NATURE, (1993), vol. 364, pages 555 - 556 | - CULL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, pages 1865 - 1869 | - SCOTT; SMITH, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 386 - 390 | - DEVLIN, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406 | - CWIRLA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1990), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382 | - FELICI, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 301 - 310 | - RIGGS ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (2005), vol. 48, pages 2313 - 2321 |