Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808937

EP2808937 - AIR BATTERY AND BATTERY PACK USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, IT, MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/02]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAZAWA, Atsushi
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / IRITSUKI, Keita
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / HIMENO, Tomokatsu
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / TSUKADA, Yoshiko
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2019/02]
Former [2014/49]01 / MIYAZAWA, Atsushi
c/o Intellectual Property Department of Nissan
Motor Co. Ltd.
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / IRITSUKI, Keita
c/o Intellectual Property Department of Nissan
Motor Co. Ltd.
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / HIMENO, Tomokatsu
c/o Intellectual Property Department of Nissan
Motor Co. Ltd.
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / TSUKADA, Yoshiko
c/o Intellectual Property Department of Nissan
Motor Co. Ltd.
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2014/49]Hoefer & Partner
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date13741397.721.01.2013
[2019/02]
WO2013JP51084
Priority number, dateJP2012001296625.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012012966
JP2013000747818.01.2013         Original published format: JP 2013007478
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111702
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808937
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808937
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/02, H01M2/14, H01M12/06, H01M12/08
[2018/41]
Former International [2015/32]H01M12/06, H01M2/14, H01M2/02
Former International [2014/49]H01M12/06, H01M2/10, H01M12/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTBATTERIE UND BATTERIEPACKUNG DAMIT[2014/49]
English:AIR BATTERY AND BATTERY PACK USING SAME[2014/49]
French:BATTERIE À AIR ET BLOC DE BATTERIES QUI UTILISE CETTE DERNIÈRE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014Translation filed 
09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Search fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2018Fee for grant paid
26.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
IT09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
LU21.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/44]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
LU21.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2757629  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0037] , [0046] - [0052] - [0057] * * claim - * * figures 2,3 *;
 [E]EP2808938  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0021] - [0023] - [0026] * * claim - * * figure 1 *;
 [XAY]US2004157101  (SMEDLEY STUART I [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0016] - [0019] - [0032] , [0035] - [0037] - [0042] , [0049] , [0052] - [0054] - [0059] , [0079] * * claims 16-18,21,22 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 2;
 [X]WO03090294  (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 26 * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 12 * * page 11, lines 1-16 * * page 15, line 37 - page 16, line 5 * * claims 14,15,25 * * figures 2,3,9 *;
 [X]US4988581  (WYCLIFFE PAUL A [CA]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 2 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPS5723479  (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figure 1 *
International search[X]JPS57121080U  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2000067937  (SONY CORP.)
by applicantJP2000067824