Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806932

EP2806932 - DISCRIMINATION OF CHEYNE-STOKES BREATHING PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ResMed Pty Ltd
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
[2019/32]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / ARMITSTEAD, Jeffrey, Peter
c/- ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, New South Wales 2253 / AU
02 / RAMANAN, Dinesh
c/- ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, New South Wales 2253 / AU
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/44]
Former [2014/49]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13741408.225.01.2013
[2018/44]
WO2013AU00063
Priority number, dateUS201261591346P27.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261591346 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110136
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806932
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806932
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00, A61B5/08, A61M16/06, A61B5/00
[2015/38]
Former International [2014/49]A61M16/00, A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON CHEYNE-STOKES-ATMUNGSMUSTERN[2014/49]
English:DISCRIMINATION OF CHEYNE-STOKES BREATHING PATTERNS[2014/49]
French:DISCRIMINATION DES MODÈLES DE RESPIRATION DE CHEYNE-STOKES[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Search fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
10.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.06.2018Fee for grant paid
15.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2016
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU25.01.2019
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7413549  (KOH STEVE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,9,15,17,23 * abstract * * column 4, lines 25-33 * * column 7, lines 1-18 * * column 8, lines 16-26 * * column 8, lines 47-58 * * column 13, line 37 - column 14, line 21 * [I] 2,5-8,10-14,16,18-22,24-28;
 [X]US2011054279  (REISFELD DANIEL [IL] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2007073181  (PU YACHUAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2005119711  (CHO YONG K [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012016218  (LAU CHUN YUI [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102008061122  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7361146  (BHARMI RUPINDER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7094207  (KOH STEVE [US]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006066337  (RESMED LTD [AU]; ARMITSTEAD JEFFREY [AU]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006070624  (KANE MICHAEL T [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004134496  (CHO YONG K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004059240  (CHO YONG KYUN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GERHARD WEINREICH ET AL, "Validation of ApneaLink as screening device for Cheyne-Stokes respiration.", SLEEP, (20090401), vol. 32, no. 4, ISSN 0161-8105, pages 553 - 557, XP055078483 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/sleep/32.4.553
International search[X]US2005119711  (CHO ET AL.);
 [X]US2007073181  (PU ET AL.);
 [X]US2011054279  (REISFELD ET AL.);
 [A]US2006070624  (KANE ET AL.);
 [A]WO2006066337  (RESMED LIMITED);
 [A]  - G. WEINREICH ET AL., "Validation of ApneaLink as Screening Device for Cheyne-Stokes Respiration", SLEEP, (2009), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 553 - 557, XP055078483

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/sleep/32.4.553
ExaminationUS2005101833