Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808797

EP2808797 - OPERATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, OPERATION MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2019/31]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YABUKI, Kentaro
c/o NEC Corporation
Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2019/14]
Former [2014/49]01 / YABUKI, Kentaro
c/o NEC Corporation, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/31]
Former [2014/49]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13741453.822.01.2013
[2019/31]
WO2013JP00264
Priority number, dateJP2012001107623.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012011076
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111560
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808797
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808797
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/34, G06F11/07
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/49]G06F11/34, G06F11/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BETRIEBSMANAGEMENTVORRICHTUNG, BETRIEBSMANAGEMENTVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR[2014/49]
English:OPERATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, OPERATION MANAGEMENT METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/49]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'OPÉRATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'OPÉRATIONS, ET PROGRAMME[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014Translation filed 
10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2019Fee for grant paid
18.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011099341  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,9 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6-8,10-12;
 [P]US2012030522  (YABUKI KENTAROU [JP]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0113] *;
 [I]US2009217099  (KATO KIYOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0149] *;
 [I]WO2011083687  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [P]EP2523115  (NEC CORP [JP]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0058] *;
 [I]  - Tim Grieser, "Invariant Analyzer: An Automated Approach to System Performance Management", (20111001), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://fr.nec.com/fr_FR/en/documents/invariant_analyzer_idc_white_paper.pdf, (20150603), XP055193383 [I] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JAN HAUKE ET AL, "Comparison of Values of Pearson's and Spearman's Correlation Coefficients on the Same Sets of Data", QUAESTIONES GEOGRAPHICAE, (20110101), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.2478/v10117-011-0021-1, ISSN 0137-477X, XP055192851 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2478/v10117-011-0021-1
International search[A]WO2011083687  (NEC CORP.)
by applicantJP2009199533