Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2808370 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2808370



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
07.10.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.08.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 47
17.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 47
26.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
26.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Description Search / examination 7
26.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.06.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.06.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.06.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 1
31.08.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
21.08.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Description Search / examination 27
25.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 15
25.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
13.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
07.07.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
01.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 39