Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2808370


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 (Expected) grant published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
14.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.08.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.06.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.06.2018 First examination report
30.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2016 Change - representative
30.03.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2015 Change - classification published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
28.08.2015 Change - classification published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
28.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
28.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication