Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808370

EP2808370 - ROLLED TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ogawa, Makiko
City Tower Kobe Sannomiya 5309
4-1-3, Asahi-dori
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0095 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Gyi, Jeffrey Ivan , et al
De Clercq & Partners
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[2019/39]
Former [2014/49]De Clercq, Ann G. Y. , et al
De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
Application number, filing date13741654.122.01.2013
[2019/39]
WO2013JP51197
Priority number, dateJP2012001570927.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012015709
[2014/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013111750
Date:01.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808370
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808370
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/58
[2019/19]
Former International [2014/49]C09J7/02, A61L15/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUFGEROLLTES BAND[2014/49]
English:ROLLED TAPE[2014/49]
French:BANDE ENROULÉE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2014Translation filed 
25.08.2014National basic fee paid 
25.08.2014Search fee paid 
25.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
24.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2019Fee for grant paid
12.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]KR20090002386  (LEE JUNG JU [KR], et al) [Y] 1-5 * figure - *;
 [Y]WO2011121659  (NITOMS KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5496605  (AUGST GEORGE W [US], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 4 *;
 [XY]JPH07101603  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 1-5
International search[X]JPH08239634  (TOPPAN MOORE KK);
 [X]JP2003285968  (SATO KK);
 [X]JPH0292889U  (HITACHI MAXELL, LTD.);
 [Y]JPH09502111  (MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO.);
 [A]JP2006320471  (NITOMUZU KK);
 [A]JPH0647071  (IGAKU KENKYUSHA KK);
 [A]JP3086908U  (SHIBATA INC.);
 [A]JP2006006514  (SHIBATA KOGYO KK)
by applicantJP2000116695