blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2877411

EP2877411 - TAMPER EVIDENT CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guala Closures S.p.A.
Via Rana 12
Frazione Spinetta Marengo
15122 Alessandria / IT
[2015/23]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Stuart
14 Holm Street
Strathaven ML10 6NB Scotland / GB
02 / MITTINO, Maurizio
Strada Provinciale 57 n. 5/a
Castelletto Monferrato
15040 Alessandria / IT
03 / GIOVANNINI, Marco
Via P. Paleocapa 4
20121 Milano / IT
 [2017/17]
Former [2015/32]01 / JOHNSON, Stuart
14 Holm Street
Strathaven ML10 6NB Scotland / GB
02 / MITTINO, Maurizio
Strada Provinciale 57 n. 5/a
Castelletto Monferrato
I-15040 Alessandria / IT
03 / GIOVANNINI, Marco
Via P. Paleocapa 4
I-20121 Milano / IT
Former [2015/23]01 / JOHNSON, Stuart
Old Mill Park Estate
Kirkintilloch
Glasgow / GB
02 / MITTINO, Maurizio
Strada Provinciale 57 n. 5/a
Castelletto Monferrato
I-15040 Alessandria / IT
03 / GIOVANNINI, Marco
Via P. Paleocapa 4
I-20121 Milano / IT
Representative(s)Perani & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Armando Diaz, 7
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/23]Bonvicini, Davide, et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13741764.825.07.2013
[2017/17]
WO2013EP65761
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0132427.07.2012         Original published format: IT MI20121324
[2015/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014016391
Date:30.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2877411
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2877411
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.01.2014
ClassificationIPC:B65D55/02, B65D41/62
[2015/23]
CPC:
B65D41/62 (EP); B65D55/026 (EP); B65D2401/45 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERER VERSCHLUSS[2015/23]
English:TAMPER EVIDENT CLOSURE[2015/23]
French:FERMETURE AVEC TÉMOIN D'INTÉGRITÉ[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase22.01.2015National basic fee paid 
22.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
15.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2017Fee for grant paid
15.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.03.2016
Opposition(s)29.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.07.2013
AL26.04.2017
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
PT26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
TR26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/28]HU25.07.2013
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
PT26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
TR26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2020/15]HU25.07.2013
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
TR26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/51]HU25.07.2013
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
MK26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/47]HU25.07.2013
AT26.04.2017
CY26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU25.07.2013
AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2019/30]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
MC26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
MT25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
LU25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SI26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
IE25.07.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
SM26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.04.2017
CZ26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RO26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
SK26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT26.04.2017
DK26.04.2017
EE26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
LV26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
PL26.04.2017
RS26.04.2017
SE26.04.2017
BG26.07.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT26.04.2017
FI26.04.2017
HR26.04.2017
LT26.04.2017
NL26.04.2017
NO26.07.2017
GR27.07.2017
IS26.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL26.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011157978  (OBRIST CLOSURES SWITZERLAND [CH], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 14; figures 1-7d; claims 1,3 *;
 [IA]WO2006117505  (OBRIST CLOSURES SWITZERLAND [CH], et al) [I] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-8c; claims 1-10 * [A] 5-9;
 [A]WO2008110917  (FABIANO NICOLA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * page 5, line 9 - page 10, line 23; figures 1-5; claims 1-8 *
by applicantCN201600446U
 EP1694576
 WO2006117505
 EP2178771
 EP1313649
 WO2011157978
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.