Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2890906

EP2890906 - RING FOR ATTACHING A BOLT TO A SUPPORT AND ASSEMBLY OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. Raymond et Cie
115, cours Berriat
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2015/28]
Inventor(s)01 / BIZZINI, Olivier
34 rue du Muret
F-38120 Saint Egrève / FR
 [2015/28]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2015/28]
Application number, filing date13742208.525.07.2013
[2016/40]
WO2013EP65715
Priority number, dateFR2012005803128.08.2012         Original published format: FR 1258031
[2015/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014032873
Date:06.03.2014
Language:FR
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2890906
Date:08.07.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014
[2015/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2890906
Date:05.10.2016
Language:FR
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16B37/08, F16B37/02
[2015/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BUCHSE ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES BOLZENS AN EINEM TRÄGER UND ENTSPRECHENDE ANORDNUNG[2016/17]
English:RING FOR ATTACHING A BOLT TO A SUPPORT AND ASSEMBLY OBTAINED[2015/28]
French:BAGUE DE FIXATION D'UNE TIGE SUR UN SUPPORT ET ASSEMBLAGE OBTENU[2015/28]
Former [2015/28]RING ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES RIEGELS AN EINEM TRÄGER UND ANORDNUNG DARAUS
Entry into regional phase30.03.2015National basic fee paid 
30.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
14.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2016Fee for grant paid
26.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.04.2016
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.07.2013
AT05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
MT05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU25.07.2013
AT05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MT05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2019/31]HU25.07.2013
AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MT05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2019/30]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MT05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MT05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/52]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/41]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE202007013238U  (HELLERMANN TYTON GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3600311  (OPPACH SCHALTELEKTRONIK [DD]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE102010018091  (NEUMAYER TEKFOR HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]WO9908006  (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR]; GOLCZYK RALPH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantDE202007013238U
 JP2005076646
 EP1472464