blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2879542

EP2879542 - METHOD FOR TESTING THE COIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/24]COIN AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE COIN
[2020/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.01.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.10.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crane Payment Innovations Ltd.
Coin House
New Coin Street
Royton
Oldham
OL2 6JZ / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2016/18]For all designated states
Crane Payment Innovations GmbH
Zum Fruchthof 6
21614 Buxtehude / DE
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
Crane Payment Solutions GmbH
Zum Fruchthof 6
21614 Buxtehude / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MEYER-STEFFENS, Klaus
Rehn-Campe 30a
21717 Deinste / DE
02 / COHRS, Hans-Ulrich
Teiledamm 5
21640 Horneburg / DE
03 / MEYER, Wilfried
Apensener Str. 100
21614 Buxtehude / DE
 [2015/24]
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Hermann-Sack-Straße 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2021/09]Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
Former [2015/24]Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date13742443.826.07.2013
[2021/09]
WO2013EP65831
Priority number, dateDE2012101495830.07.2012         Original published format: DE102012014958
[2015/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014019961
Date:06.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879542
Date:10.06.2015
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2879542
Date:03.03.2021
Language:DE
[2021/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:A44C21/00
[2015/24]
CPC:
A44C21/00 (EP,KR,US); G07D5/00 (EP,KR,US); G07D5/02 (EP,US);
G07F1/06 (EP,US); Y10T428/21 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN DER MÜNZE[2020/25]
English:METHOD FOR TESTING THE COIN[2020/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE VÉRIFIER CETTE PIÈCE DE MONNAIE[2020/25]
Former [2015/24]MÜNZE UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN DER MÜNZE
Former [2015/24]COIN AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE COIN
Former [2015/24]PIÈCE DE MONNAIE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE VÉRIFIER CETTE PIÈCE DE MONNAIE
Entry into regional phase26.02.2015National basic fee paid 
26.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
12.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.10.2020Fee for grant paid
16.10.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.09.2017
Opposition(s)06.12.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.07.2013
AL03.03.2021
CY03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
MK03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
AT26.07.2021
IE26.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU26.07.2013
AL03.03.2021
CY03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
AT26.07.2021
IE26.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2023/29]HU26.07.2013
AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
AT26.07.2021
IE26.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/48]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
AT26.07.2021
IE26.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/35]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
IE26.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/34]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
BE31.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/23]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
LU26.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
FR31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/21]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
CH31.07.2021
LI31.07.2021
Former [2022/18]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
MC03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/13]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SI03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/10]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/08]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
DK03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2022/07]AL03.03.2021
CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/51]CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
IS03.07.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/50]CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RO03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SK03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
PT05.07.2021
Former [2021/48]CZ03.03.2021
EE03.03.2021
FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/46]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
SM03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/43]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
NL03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
LV03.03.2021
RS03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
BG03.06.2021
NO03.06.2021
GR04.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI03.03.2021
HR03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
NO03.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI03.03.2021
LT03.03.2021
NO03.06.2021
Cited inInternational search[Y]US3983646  (HOWARD ROBERT) [Y] 12-21,23-25 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 54 - line 58 * * column 3, line 6 - line 63 *;
 [Y]DE2724868  (WALTER HANKE MECH WERKSTAETTEN) [Y] 12,22 * page 3, line 3 - line 20; figure 9 * * page 4, line 26 - line 37 *;
 [A]EP1136958  (GEIGER HANS AUTOMATENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0013] *;
 [XY]DE102010013148  (SAXONIA EUROCOIN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12-25
ExaminationJPH05217055
by applicantDE2724868
 EP0694888
 EP0839364
 DE102010013148
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.