Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811198 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811198



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 212
01.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.02.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.02.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
08.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
08.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.09.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.09.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
14.09.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
29.08.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
01.07.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
01.07.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
03.12.2015 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.12.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
25.11.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
07.08.2014 Description Search / examination 14
07.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.08.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
07.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 17